THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:48:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 2694
Fax: (416) 469-6253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John L. A. Abrahamson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abrahamson (CPSO#: 59824 )
Business Address: Medical Triage Clinic
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 2694

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 2694
Fax: (416) 469-6253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John L. A. Abrahamson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abrahamson (CPSO#: 59824 )
Business Address: Medical Triage Clinic
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580 Extn: 2694

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN LEWIS ALEXANDER ABRAHAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAMSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN LEWIS ALEXANDER ABRAHAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAMSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988