THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:56:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
4N 470
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4074
Fax: (416) 340-4385

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Terrence Michael Yau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Yau (CPSO#: 59842 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 4N 470
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4074

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
4N 470
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4074
Fax: (416) 340-4385

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Terrence Michael Yau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Yau (CPSO#: 59842 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 4N 470
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4074

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRENCE MICHAEL YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRENCE MICHAEL YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988