THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: Arab, Donna Martha (Used Until: 03 Jan 1996)
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 306 - Sunnyside East
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6466
Fax: (416) 530-6510

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 02 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arab-O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Arab-O'Brien (CPSO#: 59847 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
306 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6466

General Information

Former Name: Arab, Donna Martha (Used Until: 03 Jan 1996)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 306 - Sunnyside East
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6466
Fax: (416) 530-6510

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 02 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arab-O'Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Arab-O'Brien (CPSO#: 59847 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
306 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6466

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA MARTHA ARAB-O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARAB-O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA MARTHA ARAB-O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARAB-O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988