THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:38:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: 613 544-3310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Simchison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Simchison (CPSO#: 59852 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G3
(613) 544-3310

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: 613 544-3310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Simchison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Simchison (CPSO#: 59852 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G3
(613) 544-3310

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN LLOYD SIMCHISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMCHISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN LLOYD SIMCHISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMCHISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988