THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: (807) 346-8015

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. J. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Scott (CPSO#: 59861 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: (807) 346-8015

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. J. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Scott (CPSO#: 59861 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDRE JOSEPH SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDRE JOSEPH SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988