THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:59:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-106 Drynan Way
Box 70
Seeleys Bay Ontario K0H 2N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 387-3120
Fax: (613) 387-2842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Briggs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Briggs (CPSO#: 59867 )
Business Address: 1 - 106 Drynan Way
Seeleys Bay Ontario K0H 2N0
(613) 387-3120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-106 Drynan Way
Box 70
Seeleys Bay Ontario K0H 2N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 387-3120
Fax: (613) 387-2842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Briggs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Briggs (CPSO#: 59867 )
Business Address: 1 - 106 Drynan Way
Seeleys Bay Ontario K0H 2N0
(613) 387-3120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH ELLEN BRIGGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIGGS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH ELLEN BRIGGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIGGS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988