THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:55:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 4400
Fax: (416) 927-9984
Address: 790 BAY ST
SUITE 724
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Phone: 4169277321
Fax: 4169279984
Address: Sinai Health System - Bridgepoint
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Goldsand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goldsand (CPSO#: 59905 )
Business Address: Toronto Rehab
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 4000
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
(416) 461-9251 Extn: 2272
Business Address: Suite 724
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 927-7321

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 4400
Fax: (416) 927-9984
Address: 790 BAY ST
SUITE 724
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Phone: 4169277321
Fax: 4169279984
Address: Sinai Health System - Bridgepoint
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Goldsand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goldsand (CPSO#: 59905 )
Business Address: Toronto Rehab
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 4000
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
(416) 461-9251 Extn: 2272
Business Address: Suite 724
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 927-7321

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN IRA GOLDSAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN IRA GOLDSAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988