THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-359 Riverside Dr
Sudbury Ontario P3E1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-670-2000
Fax: 705-670-2006
Address: 825 MCKINNON DR.
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: (705) 869-1420
Extension: 3099
Fax: (705) 869-3081
Address: 1340 Kelly Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5P4
Phone: (705) 670-9990
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 680 Kirkwood Dr.
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-9193
Extension: 8550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Sep 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lionel Marks De Chabris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Marks De Chabris (CPSO#: 59927 )
Business Address: 907 Lorne Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 4R6
(705) 670-2000
Business Address: 10 - 450 Notre Dame
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K8
(705) 673-1116
Business Address: Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P3E 1R4
(705) 869-1429 Extn: 3099
Business Address: 1340 Kelly Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5P4
(705) 670-9990
Business Address: 680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 675-9193 Extn: 8550

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-359 Riverside Dr
Sudbury Ontario P3E1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-670-2000
Fax: 705-670-2006
Address: 825 MCKINNON DR.
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: (705) 869-1420
Extension: 3099
Fax: (705) 869-3081
Address: 1340 Kelly Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5P4
Phone: (705) 670-9990
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 680 Kirkwood Dr.
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-9193
Extension: 8550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Sep 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lionel Marks De Chabris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Marks De Chabris (CPSO#: 59927 )
Business Address: 907 Lorne Street
Sudbury Ontario P3C 4R6
(705) 670-2000
Business Address: 10 - 450 Notre Dame
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K8
(705) 673-1116
Business Address: Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P3E 1R4
(705) 869-1429 Extn: 3099
Business Address: 1340 Kelly Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5P4
(705) 670-9990
Business Address: 680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1X3
(705) 675-9193 Extn: 8550

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIONEL MARKS DE CHABRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKS DE CHABRIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIONEL MARKS DE CHABRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKS DE CHABRIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988