THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Annis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Annis (CPSO#: 59933 )
Business Address: 185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2N1
(519) 291-4200

Corporation Name: Annis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Annis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Annis (CPSO#: 59933 )
Business Address: 185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2N1
(519) 291-4200

Corporation Name: Annis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT WILLIAM FRANK ANNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANNIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT WILLIAM FRANK ANNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANNIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988