THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:38:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 4450
Fax: (705) 759-3815
Address: Algoma District Cancer Program
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 4450
Fax: (705) 759-3815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Silvana Spadafora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spadafora (CPSO#: 59935 )
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5V2
(705) 253-2848

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 4450
Fax: (705) 759-3815
Address: Algoma District Cancer Program
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 4450
Fax: (705) 759-3815

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Silvana Spadafora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spadafora (CPSO#: 59935 )
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5V2
(705) 253-2848

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SILVANA SPADAFORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPADAFORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SILVANA SPADAFORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPADAFORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988