THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:00:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 23
5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd South
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 749-5421
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 502-1355 Bank Sreet
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-2037
Fax: (613) 738-9097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.C. Kuriakose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kuriakose (CPSO#: 59937 )
Business Address: 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard South
Suite 1924
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
(613) 749-5421

Corporation Name: Binny Kuriakose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kuriakose (CPSO#: 59937 )
Business Address: 23 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard South
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
(613) 749-5421
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1G 8K7
(613) 738-1584

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 23
5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd South
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 749-5421
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 502-1355 Bank Sreet
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-2037
Fax: (613) 738-9097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.C. Kuriakose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kuriakose (CPSO#: 59937 )
Business Address: 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard South
Suite 1924
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
(613) 749-5421

Corporation Name: Binny Kuriakose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kuriakose (CPSO#: 59937 )
Business Address: 23 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard South
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
(613) 749-5421
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1G 8K7
(613) 738-1584

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BINNY CYRIAC KURIAKOSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIAKOSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BINNY CYRIAC KURIAKOSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIAKOSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988