THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:21:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Thomas Family Care Centre
50-1063 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 637-2424
Fax: (519) 637-2537

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derek Vaughan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vaughan (CPSO#: 59950 )
Business Address: Unit 50
1063 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1G4
(519) 637-2424

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Thomas Family Care Centre
50-1063 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 637-2424
Fax: (519) 637-2537

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derek Vaughan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vaughan (CPSO#: 59950 )
Business Address: Unit 50
1063 Talbot Street
St Thomas Ontario N5P 1G4
(519) 637-2424

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK JOHN VAUGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUGHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK JOHN VAUGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAUGHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988