THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:44:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 87 Mill Street North
Newcastle Ontario L1B 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 987-1896
Fax: (905) 987-9894
Address: 66 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 4G3
Phone: 289-593-0936
Fax: 905-436-9313
Address: 66 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 4G3
Phone: 905-436-9945
Fax: 905-436-9313

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Debra L. Jefferson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jefferson (CPSO#: 59956 )
Business Address: 87 Mill Street North
Newcastle Ontario L1B 1H8
(905) 987-1896

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 87 Mill Street North
Newcastle Ontario L1B 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 987-1896
Fax: (905) 987-9894
Address: 66 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 4G3
Phone: 289-593-0936
Fax: 905-436-9313
Address: 66 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 4G3
Phone: 905-436-9945
Fax: 905-436-9313

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Debra L. Jefferson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jefferson (CPSO#: 59956 )
Business Address: 87 Mill Street North
Newcastle Ontario L1B 1H8
(905) 987-1896

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRA LYNN JEFFERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFFERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRA LYNN JEFFERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFFERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988