THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:24:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Johns Hopkins University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
7 Eaton North -- room 221
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163404800
Extension: 8049
Fax: 4163404105
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
East Wing 8-423
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela M. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheung (CPSO#: 59965 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
7 Eaton North-221
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4301
Business Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Man-Wei Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Nov 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: The Johns Hopkins University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
7 Eaton North -- room 221
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163404800
Extension: 8049
Fax: 4163404105
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
East Wing 8-423
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela M. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheung (CPSO#: 59965 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
7 Eaton North-221
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4301
Business Address: Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Man-Wei Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Nov 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA MAN-WEI CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA MAN-WEI CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Johns Hopkins University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988