THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:49:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Wasserman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wasserman (CPSO#: 59977 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5071

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Wasserman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wasserman (CPSO#: 59977 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5071

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JACOB WASSERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JACOB WASSERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1988