THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:22:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 345-5645
Fax: 613-345-8319

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Ebert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ebert (CPSO#: 59992 )
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5645
Business Address: 7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1P0
(613) 584-4920
Business Address: 117 Banting Drive
Deep River Ontario K0J 1P0
(613) 584-4920
Business Address: West Nippising General Hospital
725 Coursol road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B2Y6
705-753-3110 Extn: 215

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 345-5645
Fax: 613-345-8319

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Ebert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ebert (CPSO#: 59992 )
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5645
Business Address: 7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1P0
(613) 584-4920
Business Address: 117 Banting Drive
Deep River Ontario K0J 1P0
(613) 584-4920
Business Address: West Nippising General Hospital
725 Coursol road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B2Y6
705-753-3110 Extn: 215

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY EBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY EBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988