THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 308
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 922-2052
Fax: (416) 922-3013

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charlotte I. Wedge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wedge (CPSO#: 59993 )
Business Address: Suite 308
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4
(416) 922-2052

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 308
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 922-2052
Fax: (416) 922-3013

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charlotte I. Wedge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wedge (CPSO#: 59993 )
Business Address: Suite 308
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4
(416) 922-2052

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE ISABEL WEDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEDGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE ISABEL WEDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEDGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988