THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:38:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Johns Hopkins University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5991
Fax: (416) 864-5558
Address: Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1K6
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
Address: Inner City Family Health Team
69 Queen St. E, 4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8
Phone: 416-368-5666
Fax: 416-368-2679

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Wesley Hwang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hwang (CPSO#: 60001 )
Business Address: Inner City Family Health Team
69 Queen Street East
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8
(416) 368-5666
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5991

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Johns Hopkins University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5991
Fax: (416) 864-5558
Address: Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1K6
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
Address: Inner City Family Health Team
69 Queen St. E, 4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8
Phone: 416-368-5666
Fax: 416-368-2679

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Wesley Hwang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hwang (CPSO#: 60001 )
Business Address: Inner City Family Health Team
69 Queen Street East
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8
(416) 368-5666
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5991

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN WESLEY HWANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HWANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN WESLEY HWANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HWANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Johns Hopkins University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988