THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:41:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Science Centre
Emergency Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 4515
Fax: (613) 548-6042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Dec 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Graham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Graham (CPSO#: 60024 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 4515
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 546-1240 Extn: 2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Science Centre
Emergency Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 4515
Fax: (613) 548-6042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Dec 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Graham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Graham (CPSO#: 60024 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 4515
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 546-1240 Extn: 2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LOUISE GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LOUISE GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1988