THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:51:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4522
Fax: (416) 480-4999
Address: 55 Victoria Ave.
Markdale Ontario N0C 1H0
Phone: 519-986-2222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1800 8th St. East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry S Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Smith (CPSO#: 60050 )
Business Address: Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4522

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4522
Fax: (416) 480-4999
Address: 55 Victoria Ave.
Markdale Ontario N0C 1H0
Phone: 519-986-2222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1800 8th St. East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry S Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Smith (CPSO#: 60050 )
Business Address: Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4522

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRY SIDNEY SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRY SIDNEY SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988