THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:36:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 369 Hunter Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 4G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-1851
Fax: (519) 421-9234

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Lui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lui (CPSO#: 60065 )
Business Address: 369 Hunter Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 4G3
(519) 421-1851

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 369 Hunter Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 4G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-1851
Fax: (519) 421-9234

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Lui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lui (CPSO#: 60065 )
Business Address: 369 Hunter Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 4G3
(519) 421-1851

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK POK-KEUNG LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK POK-KEUNG LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988