THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:56:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus - Box 228
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 737-8923
Fax: (613) 737-8925

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 05 Aug 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DW Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cameron (CPSO#: 60117 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8923

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus - Box 228
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 737-8923
Fax: (613) 737-8925

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 05 Aug 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DW Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cameron (CPSO#: 60117 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8923

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD WILLIAM CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD WILLIAM CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1988