THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Extension: 6053
Fax: (905) 430-4020
Address: 600-3250 Bloor Street W
Etobicoke ON M8X 2X9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3250 Bloor St W
East Tower
Suite 600
Etobicoke ON M8X 2X9
Phone: 416 578-8130
Fax: 905 430-4020

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Klassen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Klassen (CPSO#: 60139 )
Business Address: 3250 Bloor Street West
East Tower
Suite 600
Toronto Ontario M8X2X9
416 578-8130
Business Address: 340 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5A 2H9
(416) 578-8130
Business Address: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
(416) 578-8130

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Extension: 6053
Fax: (905) 430-4020
Address: 600-3250 Bloor Street W
Etobicoke ON M8X 2X9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3250 Bloor St W
East Tower
Suite 600
Etobicoke ON M8X 2X9
Phone: 416 578-8130
Fax: 905 430-4020

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Klassen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Klassen (CPSO#: 60139 )
Business Address: 3250 Bloor Street West
East Tower
Suite 600
Toronto Ontario M8X2X9
416 578-8130
Business Address: 340 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5A 2H9
(416) 578-8130
Business Address: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
(416) 578-8130

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP EDWIN KLASSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLASSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP EDWIN KLASSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLASSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1988