THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:45:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 3-50
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Himanshu Lukka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lukka (CPSO#: 60180 )
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9495 Extn: 64663

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, SWAHILI
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 3-50
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Himanshu Lukka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lukka (CPSO#: 60180 )
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
(905) 387-9495 Extn: 64663

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIMANSHU RANCHHODDAS LUKKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIMANSHU RANCHHODDAS LUKKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1988