THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:35:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1883 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 7Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 526-3377
Fax: (613) 260-1887
Address: 1883 BANK STREET
Ottawa Ontario K1V 7Z9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 05 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uday Chadha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Chadha (CPSO#: 60215 )
Business Address: 1883 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 7Z9
(613) 526-3377

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1883 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 7Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 526-3377
Fax: (613) 260-1887
Address: 1883 BANK STREET
Ottawa Ontario K1V 7Z9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 05 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uday Chadha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Chadha (CPSO#: 60215 )
Business Address: 1883 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 7Z9
(613) 526-3377

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UDAY CHADHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UDAY CHADHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rajasthan University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 1988