THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:28:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1655 Kilborn Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1H 6M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 739-5437
Fax: (613) 739-5432

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HECTOR MCDONALD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: Hector McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1655 Kilborn Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1H 6M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 739-5437
Fax: (613) 739-5432

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HECTOR MCDONALD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: Hector McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HECTOR MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HECTOR MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1988