THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:34:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite A
1909 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-7671
Fax: (519) 258-9281

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 23 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaher (CPSO#: 60278 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite A
1909 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-7671
Fax: (519) 258-9281

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 23 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaher (CPSO#: 60278 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMJAD NIZAMEDDIN ZAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMJAD NIZAMEDDIN ZAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1988