THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:23:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 310
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 493-1314
Fax: (416) 502-3984

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leung (CPSO#: 60309 )
Business Address: 310 - 385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0E3
(416) 493-1314

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 310
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 493-1314
Fax: (416) 502-3984

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leung (CPSO#: 60309 )
Business Address: 310 - 385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0E3
(416) 493-1314

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES CHI KAY LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES CHI KAY LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 1988