THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:47:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 305
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 820-5464
Fax: (905) 569-2377

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew S. Budning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Budning (CPSO#: 60349 )
Business Address: 305 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 820-5464

Corporation Name: Andrew S. Budning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jun 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 305
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 820-5464
Fax: (905) 569-2377

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew S. Budning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Budning (CPSO#: 60349 )
Business Address: 305 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 820-5464

Corporation Name: Andrew S. Budning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jun 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW STEWART BUDNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUDNING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW STEWART BUDNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUDNING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1988
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 1988