THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Centre for Medical Imaging
Suite 910
150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 368-8488
Fax: (416) 368-5217

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ismail (CPSO#: 60370 )
Business Address: The Toronto Centre for Medical Imaging
910 - 150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
(416) 368-8488

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Centre for Medical Imaging
Suite 910
150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 368-8488
Fax: (416) 368-5217

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ismail (CPSO#: 60370 )
Business Address: The Toronto Centre for Medical Imaging
910 - 150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
(416) 368-8488

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALNASHIR ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALNASHIR ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 1988