THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:10:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4632 Victoria Avenue
Niagara Falls, ON
St. Catharines Ontario L2E 4B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 358-7720
Fax: (905) 358-6413

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. M. Hildebrand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hildebrand (CPSO#: 60561 )
Business Address: 68 Royal Henley Blvd
St Catharines ON L2N 4S1
289-407-9762

Corporation Name: B.M. Hildebrand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4632 Victoria Avenue
Niagara Falls, ON
St. Catharines Ontario L2E 4B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 358-7720
Fax: (905) 358-6413

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. M. Hildebrand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hildebrand (CPSO#: 60561 )
Business Address: 68 Royal Henley Blvd
St Catharines ON L2N 4S1
289-407-9762

Corporation Name: B.M. Hildebrand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD MARK HILDEBRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILDEBRAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD MARK HILDEBRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILDEBRAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1989
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 1989