THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:05:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, XHOSA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 King Street
P O Box 1376
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 749-9064
Fax: (705) 749-9842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M'Cwabeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. M'Cwabeni (CPSO#: 60612 )
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140
Business Address: PRHC - 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, XHOSA
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 King Street
P O Box 1376
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 749-9064
Fax: (705) 749-9842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M'Cwabeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. M'Cwabeni (CPSO#: 60612 )
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140
Business Address: PRHC - 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CONSTANTINE TEMBA M'CWABENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. M'CWABENI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CONSTANTINE TEMBA M'CWABENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. M'CWABENI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 02 May 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 02 May 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 24 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 1989