THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:02:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Norfolk Medical Centre
85 Norfolk Street
Suite 204A
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 821-4421
Fax: (519) 821-3341
Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (519) 527-0271
Extension: 46330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 14 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Jichici Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jichici (CPSO#: 60644 )
Business Address: Norfolk Medical Centre
204A - 85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
(519) 821-9861
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-0271

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Norfolk Medical Centre
85 Norfolk Street
Suite 204A
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 821-4421
Fax: (519) 821-3341
Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (519) 527-0271
Extension: 46330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 14 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Jichici Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jichici (CPSO#: 60644 )
Business Address: Norfolk Medical Centre
204A - 85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
(519) 821-9861
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-0271

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DRAGA JICHICI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JICHICI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DRAGA JICHICI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JICHICI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989