THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:11:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 942 Wildcarrot Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-822-4402
Fax: 8553785348
Address: 4145 North Service Rd
Burlington ON L7L 6A3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7074
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sandre (CPSO#: 60647 )
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7074

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 942 Wildcarrot Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-822-4402
Fax: 8553785348
Address: 4145 North Service Rd
Burlington ON L7L 6A3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7074
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sandre (CPSO#: 60647 )
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7074

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROGER MARTIN SANDRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROGER MARTIN SANDRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989