THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:06:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Queen's University
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: 6139697400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5709 Hazeldean Rd
Stittsville ON K2S 0P6
Phone: 6137141000
Fax: 6137281120
Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
Phone: 7052672131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Quinte Health Belleville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Davies (CPSO#: 60653 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-6072
Business Address: Suite D
1609 Stittsville Main
Stittsville Ontario K2S 1N5
(613) 714-1000
Business Address: 2-5709 Hazeldean Rd
Stittsville ON K2S 0P6
6137141000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Queen's University
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: 6139697400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5709 Hazeldean Rd
Stittsville ON K2S 0P6
Phone: 6137141000
Fax: 6137281120
Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
Phone: 7052672131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Quinte Health Belleville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Davies (CPSO#: 60653 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-6072
Business Address: Suite D
1609 Stittsville Main
Stittsville Ontario K2S 1N5
(613) 714-1000
Business Address: 2-5709 Hazeldean Rd
Stittsville ON K2S 0P6
6137141000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY ARTHUR LLEWELLYN DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY ARTHUR LLEWELLYN DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989