THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:20:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Surrey Street West
Guelph Ontario N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-826-0903
Fax: 226-314-1240

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patti Galvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Galvin (CPSO#: 60659 )
Business Address: 21 Surrey Street West
201
Guelph Ontario N1H 3R3
519-826-0903
Business Address: Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1A8
(519) 837-2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Surrey Street West
Guelph Ontario N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-826-0903
Fax: 226-314-1240

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patti Galvin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Galvin (CPSO#: 60659 )
Business Address: 21 Surrey Street West
201
Guelph Ontario N1H 3R3
519-826-0903
Business Address: Unit 3
86 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1A8
(519) 837-2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATTI ANN GALVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALVIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATTI ANN GALVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALVIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989