THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:48:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Cardiovascular Associates
402 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-2550
Fax: (905) 848-5037

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiothoracic Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiothoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Cutrara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cutrara (CPSO#: 60677 )
Business Address: 89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
9058482550

Corporation Name: Charles Cutrara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Cardiovascular Associates
402 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-2550
Fax: (905) 848-5037

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiothoracic Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiothoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Cutrara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cutrara (CPSO#: 60677 )
Business Address: 89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
9058482550

Corporation Name: Charles Cutrara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES AUGUSTINE CUTRARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTRARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES AUGUSTINE CUTRARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTRARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989