THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:13:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
A3-142
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 36378
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 International Blvd
Mississauga Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 416-675-4530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 27 May 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Driman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Driman (CPSO#: 60688 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario M9W 6J6
(416) 675-4530
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
University Hospital Room A3-142
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 36378

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
A3-142
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 36378
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 International Blvd
Mississauga Ontario M9W 6J6
Phone: 416-675-4530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 27 May 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Driman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Driman (CPSO#: 60688 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario M9W 6J6
(416) 675-4530
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
University Hospital Room A3-142
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 36378

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KEVIN DRIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRIMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KEVIN DRIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRIMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 1989