THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:20:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Neuromuscular Centre
ES21
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8689
Fax: 613-737-8857

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Pringle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pringle (CPSO#: 60692 )
Business Address: 2337 River Rd
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
6137378689

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Pringle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Neuromuscular Centre
ES21
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8689
Fax: 613-737-8857

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Pringle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pringle (CPSO#: 60692 )
Business Address: 2337 River Rd
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
6137378689

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Pringle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH PRINGLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRINGLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH PRINGLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRINGLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989