THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:19:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1419 Carling Ave.
Suite 216
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6216
Fax: (613) 722-2177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Saar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Saar (CPSO#: 60704 )
Business Address: Suite 216
1419 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7L6
(613) 722-6216

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1419 Carling Ave.
Suite 216
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6216
Fax: (613) 722-2177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Saar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Saar (CPSO#: 60704 )
Business Address: Suite 216
1419 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7L6
(613) 722-6216

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ERNEST SAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ERNEST SAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989