THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:26:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3390
Fax: (613) 549-8385
Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 11 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.W. Ten Hove Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ten Hove (CPSO#: 60709 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400 Extn: 3389
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 484-1088

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3390
Fax: (613) 549-8385
Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 11 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.W. Ten Hove Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ten Hove (CPSO#: 60709 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400 Extn: 3389
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 484-1088

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN WILLIAM TEN HOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEN HOVE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN WILLIAM TEN HOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEN HOVE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989