THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:22:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 867 Upper Paradise Rd
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 574-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Ophthalmology
100 King St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Ophthalmology
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Regional Eye Institute
2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 4X3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 10 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vineet I. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Arora (CPSO#: 60718 )
Business Address: 867 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
(905) 574-2500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 867 Upper Paradise Rd
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 574-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Ophthalmology
100 King St W
Hamilton ON L8P 1A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Ophthalmology
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Regional Eye Institute
2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 4X3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 10 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vineet I. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Arora (CPSO#: 60718 )
Business Address: 867 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
(905) 574-2500

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
28 Oct 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 28 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from October 28, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vineet Iqbal Arora in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Arora to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. VINEET IQBAL ARORA
(“Dr. Arora”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Practice Location” or “Practice Locations” means each and every location at which Dr. Arora practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises or Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Arora, certificate of registration number 60718, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-466619-D1C0S4 (the “Investigation”) into my ophthalmology practice.

(4) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking dated June 21, 2015 (“the June 2015 undertaking”) which restricted my practice. This Undertaking does not supersede or replace the June 2015 undertaking, which remains in effect.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6) Clinical Supervision

(a) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the “Clinical Supervisor” or “Clinical Supervisors”), for at least six (6) months (“Clinical Supervision”). Clinical Supervision shall cease only upon approval from the College.

(b) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to remain free of any conflict of interest with the Clinical Supervisor.

(c) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i) Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”;
(ii) Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;
(iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for a minimum of three (3) months;
(iv) After a minimum of three (3) months of Clinical Supervision, if my Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month for a further three (3) months;
(v) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;
(vi) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
(vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;
(viii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision;
(ix) Submit written reports to the College at least once every month for three (3) months or until the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, and then once at the end of supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice; and
(x) Remain free of any conflict of interest with me.

(d) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, as well as concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(e) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix “A” to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(f) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to ensure that Appendix “A” to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(g) I, Dr. Arora, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix “A” to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(h) I, Dr. Arora, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(f) and/or (g) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(i) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (6)(h) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(7) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):

(i) Medical Record-Keeping Workshop, University of Toronto;
(ii) Documentation: Principles of Medical Record Keeping eLearning Module, Canadian Medical Protective Association;
(iii) Review, reflection, and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of the following policies and other self-study:

1. Dahrouj M, Gong DA. Retinal Detachment. UpToDate. UpToDate; 2023;
2. Medical Records Documentation, College policy;

(iv) any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that if any of the programs and/or self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(8) Reassessment of Practice

(a) I, Dr. Arora, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6) above and Appendix “A” to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (7) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (“the Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessor” or “Assessors”). I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.

(d) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

(9) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to inform the College of each and every one of my Practice Locations within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Arora, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “C”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(14) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(15) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Arora’s ophthalmology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Arora will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.

Dr. Arora will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, in the appropriate evaluation and management of retinal detachment and related precursor conditions including retinal holes, and in the appropriate indications for Optical Coherence Tomography Scans.

Dr. Arora’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.

(c) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19) I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking set out at Appendix “A” to this Undertaking;

(c) any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(d) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(e) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2 of 2)

As from June 21, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vineet Iqbal Arora, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Arora to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Arora shall have a maximum of eighty (80) patient encounters per day.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from October 28, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vineet Iqbal Arora in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Arora to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. VINEET IQBAL ARORA
(“Dr. Arora”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Practice Location” or “Practice Locations” means each and every location at which Dr. Arora practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises or Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Arora, certificate of registration number 60718, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-466619-D1C0S4 (the “Investigation”) into my ophthalmology practice.

(4) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking dated June 21, 2015 (“the June 2015 undertaking”) which restricted my practice. This Undertaking does not supersede or replace the June 2015 undertaking, which remains in effect.

B. UNDERTAKING

(5) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6) Clinical Supervision

(a) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the “Clinical Supervisor” or “Clinical Supervisors”), for at least six (6) months (“Clinical Supervision”). Clinical Supervision shall cease only upon approval from the College.

(b) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to remain free of any conflict of interest with the Clinical Supervisor.

(c) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i) Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”;
(ii) Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;
(iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for a minimum of three (3) months;
(iv) After a minimum of three (3) months of Clinical Supervision, if my Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, my Clinical Supervisor will meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month for a further three (3) months;
(v) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;
(vi) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
(vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;
(viii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision;
(ix) Submit written reports to the College at least once every month for three (3) months or until the College approves a reduction in the level of supervision, and then once at the end of supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice; and
(x) Remain free of any conflict of interest with me.

(d) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, as well as concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(e) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix “A” to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(f) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to ensure that Appendix “A” to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(g) I, Dr. Arora, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix “A” to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(h) I, Dr. Arora, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(f) and/or (g) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(i) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (6)(h) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(7) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “B”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):

(i) Medical Record-Keeping Workshop, University of Toronto;
(ii) Documentation: Principles of Medical Record Keeping eLearning Module, Canadian Medical Protective Association;
(iii) Review, reflection, and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of the following policies and other self-study:

1. Dahrouj M, Gong DA. Retinal Detachment. UpToDate. UpToDate; 2023;
2. Medical Records Documentation, College policy;

(iv) any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that if any of the programs and/or self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(8) Reassessment of Practice

(a) I, Dr. Arora, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6) above and Appendix “A” to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (7) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (“the Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessor” or “Assessors”). I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.

(d) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

(9) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Arora, undertake to inform the College of each and every one of my Practice Locations within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Arora, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “C”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(14) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(15) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(16) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Arora’s ophthalmology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Arora will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.

Dr. Arora will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, in the appropriate evaluation and management of retinal detachment and related precursor conditions including retinal holes, and in the appropriate indications for Optical Coherence Tomography Scans.

Dr. Arora’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.

(c) I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT

(17) I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19) I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b) any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor’s undertaking set out at Appendix “A” to this Undertaking;

(c) any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(d) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(e) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2 of 2)

As from June 21, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vineet Iqbal Arora, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Arora to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Arora shall have a maximum of eighty (80) patient encounters per day.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 09 Jan 2019
Summary of Decision:
On January 9, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Vineet Iqbal Arora committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regarding to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADMISSION

Dr. Arora is a 53-year-old ophthalmologist who received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 1989. Dr. Arora practices in Hamilton, Ontario.

On June 21, 2015, Dr. Arora entered into an Undertaking with the College whereby he agreed to, among other things:
- restrict his number of daily patient encounters to a maximum of eighty (80) patient encounters per day except on days when he is on-call for the Ophthalmology Service at Hamilton Health Science and St. Joseph’s Health Centre; and
-maintain a call log verifying all patients seen above the ordinary 80 patient maximum.

In September 2016, the College received correspondence from the Ministry of Health and Long- Term Care, indicating that on various dates between June 21, 2015 and August 22, 2016, Dr. Arora had claimed for more than 80 fee codes which require a direct encounter with the patient. Dr. Arora was on-call on one of these dates. Dr. Arora did not maintain a call log verifying all patients seen above the ordinary 80 patient maximum on the dates when he was on-call.
Dr. Arora admits that, based on these facts, he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by breaching the terms of his June 2015 Undertaking to the College.

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS RELEVANT TO PENALTY

Complaints resolved by the June 2015 Undertaking and a caution-in-person
The June 2015 Undertaking was directed by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College (the “ICRC”) in resolution of 2 separate patient complaints. Each of these complaints involved an allegation that Dr. Arora communicated in a rude and unprofessional manner. The ICRC noted that Dr. Arora had a history of complaints regarding communications and expressed its view that Dr. Arora’s high-volume, high-stress practice contributed to his communication difficulties. In addition to accepting Dr. Arora’s June 2015 Undertaking in resolution of each complaint, the ICRC also directed that Dr. Arora attend at the College to be cautioned in respect to patient communications.

Relevant College history
Apart from the matter at hand, Dr. Arora has no prior discipline history with the College. Prior to the complaints resolved by the June 2015 Undertaking, Dr. Arora had been the subject of a number of complaints to the College between 1996 and 2011 regarding rude and unprofessional communications with patients.
In February 2007, in resolution of several complaints, Dr. Arora entered into an undertaking to complete a course in Medical Record-Keeping for Surgical Specialties and a course in Physician- Patient Communications. The undertaking was fulfilled. The Complaints Committee also directed that Dr. Arora attend at the College to be cautioned in respect to patient communications. On May 14, 2007, the Co-Chair of the Complaints Committee wrote a warning letter to Dr. Arora. In that letter, he noted Dr. Arora’s history of patient complaints regarding communications and conveyed that he expected that the College would not have to deal with matters of a similar nature again. In June 2011, in resolution of a patient complaint, the ICRC directed that Dr. Arora attend at the College to be cautioned about maintaining professional communications with patients at all times. On December 5, 2011, the Chair of the ICRC wrote a warning letter to Dr. Arora. In that letter, he noted Dr. Arora’s caution-in-person regarding unprofessional communications and advised Dr. Arora that the matter of repeated complaints of a similar nature and his failure to respond to the Committee’s first warning may be brought to the attention of the ICRC should such episodes happen again.

Additional information
The June 2015 Undertaking provides that Dr. Arora was to practice under the guidance of a preceptor for a minimum of two (2) years and to see a therapist who is a member of a regulated health profession for a minimum of one (1) year. Dr. Arora continues to meet regularly with his preceptor and see a therapist, although he is no longer required to do so pursuant to the terms of his June 2015 Undertaking. Dr. Arora’s therapist, Ms Stephanie Swayne, has continued to provide reports on his progress to the College.

Since entering into the June 2015 Undertaking, Dr. Arora has not been the subject of any new patient complaints to the College regarding rude or unprofessional communications. Dr. Arora has advised the College that, since being notified of the College’s concerns regarding compliance with the June 2015 Undertaking, he has made a number of changes to his practice, including: implementing a new system to track appointments; instructing his staff to book fewer appointments per day; and making changes to his staff, including hiring new staff. There is no evidence that Dr. Arora has exceeded 80 patient encounters a day since he was informed of the breach of his June 2015 Undertaking by the College, on December 13, 2016.

DISPOSITION

The Discipline Committee ordered that:
The Registrar suspend Dr. Arora’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, commencing from February 25, 2019 at 12:01 a.m.

The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Arora’s certificate of registration:
o Dr. Arora will participate in and unconditionally pass the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, with a report or reports to be provided by the provider to the College regarding Dr. Arora’s progress and compliance. Dr. Arora will complete this requirement within 6 months, or, if it is not possible to do so within 6 months, at the first available PROBE Ethics and Boundaries program for which Dr. Arora is eligible.
- Dr. Arora attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Arora pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

Dr. Arora waived his right to an appeal under subsection 70(1) of the Code and the Committee administered the public reprimand.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): January 9, 2019 9:00 a.m. start

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Oct 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vineet Iqbal Arora to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 28, 2024:
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Arora’s ophthalmology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Arora will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.

Dr. Arora will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, in the appropriate evaluation and management of retinal detachment and related precursor conditions including retinal holes, and in the appropriate indications for Optical Coherence Tomography Scans.

Dr. Arora’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 09 Jan 2019
Summary of Decision:
On January 9, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Vineet Iqbal Arora committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regarding to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADMISSION

Dr. Arora is a 53-year-old ophthalmologist who received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 1989. Dr. Arora practices in Hamilton, Ontario.

On June 21, 2015, Dr. Arora entered into an Undertaking with the College whereby he agreed to, among other things:
- restrict his number of daily patient encounters to a maximum of eighty (80) patient encounters per day except on days when he is on-call for the Ophthalmology Service at Hamilton Health Science and St. Joseph’s Health Centre; and
-maintain a call log verifying all patients seen above the ordinary 80 patient maximum.

In September 2016, the College received correspondence from the Ministry of Health and Long- Term Care, indicating that on various dates between June 21, 2015 and August 22, 2016, Dr. Arora had claimed for more than 80 fee codes which require a direct encounter with the patient. Dr. Arora was on-call on one of these dates. Dr. Arora did not maintain a call log verifying all patients seen above the ordinary 80 patient maximum on the dates when he was on-call.
Dr. Arora admits that, based on these facts, he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by breaching the terms of his June 2015 Undertaking to the College.

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS RELEVANT TO PENALTY

Complaints resolved by the June 2015 Undertaking and a caution-in-person
The June 2015 Undertaking was directed by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College (the “ICRC”) in resolution of 2 separate patient complaints. Each of these complaints involved an allegation that Dr. Arora communicated in a rude and unprofessional manner. The ICRC noted that Dr. Arora had a history of complaints regarding communications and expressed its view that Dr. Arora’s high-volume, high-stress practice contributed to his communication difficulties. In addition to accepting Dr. Arora’s June 2015 Undertaking in resolution of each complaint, the ICRC also directed that Dr. Arora attend at the College to be cautioned in respect to patient communications.

Relevant College history
Apart from the matter at hand, Dr. Arora has no prior discipline history with the College. Prior to the complaints resolved by the June 2015 Undertaking, Dr. Arora had been the subject of a number of complaints to the College between 1996 and 2011 regarding rude and unprofessional communications with patients.
In February 2007, in resolution of several complaints, Dr. Arora entered into an undertaking to complete a course in Medical Record-Keeping for Surgical Specialties and a course in Physician- Patient Communications. The undertaking was fulfilled. The Complaints Committee also directed that Dr. Arora attend at the College to be cautioned in respect to patient communications. On May 14, 2007, the Co-Chair of the Complaints Committee wrote a warning letter to Dr. Arora. In that letter, he noted Dr. Arora’s history of patient complaints regarding communications and conveyed that he expected that the College would not have to deal with matters of a similar nature again. In June 2011, in resolution of a patient complaint, the ICRC directed that Dr. Arora attend at the College to be cautioned about maintaining professional communications with patients at all times. On December 5, 2011, the Chair of the ICRC wrote a warning letter to Dr. Arora. In that letter, he noted Dr. Arora’s caution-in-person regarding unprofessional communications and advised Dr. Arora that the matter of repeated complaints of a similar nature and his failure to respond to the Committee’s first warning may be brought to the attention of the ICRC should such episodes happen again.

Additional information
The June 2015 Undertaking provides that Dr. Arora was to practice under the guidance of a preceptor for a minimum of two (2) years and to see a therapist who is a member of a regulated health profession for a minimum of one (1) year. Dr. Arora continues to meet regularly with his preceptor and see a therapist, although he is no longer required to do so pursuant to the terms of his June 2015 Undertaking. Dr. Arora’s therapist, Ms Stephanie Swayne, has continued to provide reports on his progress to the College.

Since entering into the June 2015 Undertaking, Dr. Arora has not been the subject of any new patient complaints to the College regarding rude or unprofessional communications. Dr. Arora has advised the College that, since being notified of the College’s concerns regarding compliance with the June 2015 Undertaking, he has made a number of changes to his practice, including: implementing a new system to track appointments; instructing his staff to book fewer appointments per day; and making changes to his staff, including hiring new staff. There is no evidence that Dr. Arora has exceeded 80 patient encounters a day since he was informed of the breach of his June 2015 Undertaking by the College, on December 13, 2016.

DISPOSITION

The Discipline Committee ordered that:
The Registrar suspend Dr. Arora’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, commencing from February 25, 2019 at 12:01 a.m.

The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Arora’s certificate of registration:
o Dr. Arora will participate in and unconditionally pass the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, with a report or reports to be provided by the provider to the College regarding Dr. Arora’s progress and compliance. Dr. Arora will complete this requirement within 6 months, or, if it is not possible to do so within 6 months, at the first available PROBE Ethics and Boundaries program for which Dr. Arora is eligible.
- Dr. Arora attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Arora pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

Dr. Arora waived his right to an appeal under subsection 70(1) of the Code and the Committee administered the public reprimand.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): January 9, 2019 9:00 a.m. start

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Oct 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vineet Iqbal Arora to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 28, 2024:
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Arora’s ophthalmology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Arora will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six months.

Dr. Arora will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, in the appropriate evaluation and management of retinal detachment and related precursor conditions including retinal holes, and in the appropriate indications for Optical Coherence Tomography Scans.

Dr. Arora’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 28 Oct 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 08 Sep 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 05 May 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 08 Aug 2019
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 25 Mar 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 09 Jan 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 27 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 05 May 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989