THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:05:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen-Lee Eldridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Eldridge (CPSO#: 60719 )
Business Address: Unit 202
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
(705) 743-3804
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen-Lee Eldridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Eldridge (CPSO#: 60719 )
Business Address: Unit 202
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2H7
(705) 743-3804
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN-LEE ELDRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDRIDGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN-LEE ELDRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989