THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:32:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
Room 821
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorne Tugg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tugg (CPSO#: 60720 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Suite 805B
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000 Extn: 6629

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie Street
Room 821
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorne Tugg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tugg (CPSO#: 60720 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Suite 805B
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000 Extn: 6629

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE ANDREW TUGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUGG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE ANDREW TUGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUGG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989