THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4370
Fax: (519) 749-4378

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 16 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. McCarron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. McCarron (CPSO#: 60721 )
Business Address: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2G3
(519) 749-4300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4370
Fax: (519) 749-4378

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 16 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. McCarron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. McCarron (CPSO#: 60721 )
Business Address: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2G3
(519) 749-4300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BONNIE ISABEL MCCARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARRON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BONNIE ISABEL MCCARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARRON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989