THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:35:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Belleville General Hospital
P O Box 428
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-969-5511
Extension: 2434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael de la Roche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. M. De La Roche (CPSO#: 60723 )
Business Address: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Belleville General Hospital
P O Box 428
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-969-5511
Extension: 2434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael de la Roche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. M. De La Roche (CPSO#: 60723 )
Business Address: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1E2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL RICHMOND PIERRE DE LA ROCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LA ROCHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL RICHMOND PIERRE DE LA ROCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LA ROCHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989