THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:44:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-5311
Fax: (705) 728-5601
Address: Unit # 3D
35 Upper Centennial Pkwy
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: 1-905 6623139
Fax: 9056623140
Address: Suite 308B
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2J3Z4
Phone: 15195851796
Fax: 5195840770
Address: Suite 404
220 Dundas St West
Whitby Ontario L1N8M7
Phone: 19054939222
Fax: 9054399221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Browning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Browning (CPSO#: 60726 )
Business Address: 3 Black Forest Lane
Oro-Medonte ON L0L 2L0
Business Address: 305 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 721-3155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-5311
Fax: (705) 728-5601
Address: Unit # 3D
35 Upper Centennial Pkwy
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
Phone: 1-905 6623139
Fax: 9056623140
Address: Suite 308B
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2J3Z4
Phone: 15195851796
Fax: 5195840770
Address: Suite 404
220 Dundas St West
Whitby Ontario L1N8M7
Phone: 19054939222
Fax: 9054399221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Browning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Browning (CPSO#: 60726 )
Business Address: 3 Black Forest Lane
Oro-Medonte ON L0L 2L0
Business Address: 305 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 721-3155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW DON BROWNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWNING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW DON BROWNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWNING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989