THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:10:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kyunghee University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite A
3473 Weston Rd
Weston Ontario M9M 0G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 742-4646
Fax: (416) 742-0138

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seong Dong Choe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Choe (CPSO#: 60732 )
Business Address: A-3473 Weston Rd
North York ON M9M 0G4
(416) 742-4646

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: Kyunghee University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite A
3473 Weston Rd
Weston Ontario M9M 0G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 742-4646
Fax: (416) 742-0138

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seong Dong Choe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Choe (CPSO#: 60732 )
Business Address: A-3473 Weston Rd
North York ON M9M 0G4
(416) 742-4646

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEONG DONG CHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEONG DONG CHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kyunghee University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989