THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:58:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Rd
Parkwood Institute/ Main Building
PMR/ EMG
B4-174
London ON N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196466100
Extension: 65364
Fax: 5196466174

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas A Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Miller (CPSO#: 60736 )
Business Address: 550 Wellington Rd
PO Box 5777, Stn B
London ON N6C 0A7
519 646 6100 Extn: 65364

Corporation Name: Thomas A. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Rd
Parkwood Institute/ Main Building
PMR/ EMG
B4-174
London ON N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196466100
Extension: 65364
Fax: 5196466174

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas A Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Miller (CPSO#: 60736 )
Business Address: 550 Wellington Rd
PO Box 5777, Stn B
London ON N6C 0A7
519 646 6100 Extn: 65364

Corporation Name: Thomas A. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS ALLEN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS ALLEN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989