THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:58:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055229101
Fax: 7055225744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stanislaw Tubin Medicine Professional Corporat
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tubin (CPSO#: 60747 )
Business Address: 2 - 2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 522-9101 Extn: 210

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055229101
Fax: 7055225744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stanislaw Tubin Medicine Professional Corporat
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tubin (CPSO#: 60747 )
Business Address: 2 - 2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 522-9101 Extn: 210

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STANISLAW TUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUBIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STANISLAW TUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUBIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989